|
10/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2527.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|