|
10/12/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 715, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2701.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD., E. & C.A. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 1887.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|