09/01/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 207, Statutes of 2017. | |||
09/01/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/25/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2173.). | ||
Senate | 06/14/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13). | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 28. Page 1381.) | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 4). | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |