|
09/27/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6491.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5445.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Atkins.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1897.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|