California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1120 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Amended

Bill September 1, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill April 25, 2017