Senate | 06/01/2017 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1618.) | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |