Assembly | 02/01/2018 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mark Stone. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 7.) (May 17). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |