California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1164 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill July 6, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017