Senate | 09/14/2017 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Portantino. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2017 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1394.) | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |