Senate | 06/20/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2017 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1721.). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |