California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1178 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2017

Amended

Bill July 12, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill March 30, 2017