California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Amended

Bill May 10, 2017
Bill May 3, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill April 5, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017