|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 3021.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2459.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 1137.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|