California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1192 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill June 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2018

Amended

Bill May 7, 2018
Bill April 20, 2017
Bill March 30, 2017