|
10/08/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3123.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2528.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 1836.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|