California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1206 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 6, 2017

Amended

Bill August 29, 2017
Bill June 28, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017