|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 3142.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2574.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 19. Page 1967.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|