Senate | 05/26/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1394.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |