Assembly
|
02/01/2018
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2018
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|