California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill July 2, 2018
Bill June 13, 2018
Bill September 8, 2017
Bill September 1, 2017
Bill July 19, 2017
Bill July 6, 2017
Bill May 26, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017