|
07/31/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 149, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2024.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1305.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|