Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 5. Page 2050.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|