|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:40 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1840.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1146.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|