Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |