|
09/22/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 6983.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 5810.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1858.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|