|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2562.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1837.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|