Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1721.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|