California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill September 1, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill March 30, 2017