Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 1856.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|