|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3331.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2786.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 15. Page 2003.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|