California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2017

Amended

Bill July 3, 2017
Bill June 13, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017