|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2828.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2129.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1968.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|