Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 1661.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|