California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1328 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2017

Amended

Bill September 6, 2017
Bill July 17, 2017
Bill June 29, 2017
Bill June 21, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017