California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill June 20, 2018
Bill April 27, 2017
Bill March 30, 2017