|
08/15/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3862.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1394.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|