|
10/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 667, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2477.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Measure version as amended on March 30 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 2045.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|