Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2017 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |