California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1395 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill January 22, 2018
Bill January 12, 2018
Bill January 3, 2018
Bill March 30, 2017