|
09/27/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2934.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2331.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 1886.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|