California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2017

Amended

Bill August 23, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017