Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 2073.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|