|
09/30/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3101.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2474.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 1533.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|