California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2017

Amended

Bill July 3, 2017
Bill May 15, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017