Senate | 09/01/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2017 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2017 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1978.) | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2017 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Read first time. To print. |