California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1423 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill June 14, 2018
Bill April 12, 2018
Bill March 28, 2017