Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1472.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|