California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1448 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2017

Amended

Bill September 6, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill May 18, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017