|
10/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2936.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2307.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 1307.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|