|
10/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 560, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2335.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1786.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|